OR HB2728 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Chapter 527, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Chapter 527, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to direct deposits to Oregon 529 College Savings Network accounts; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to direct deposits to Oregon 529 College Savings Network accounts; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Chapter 527, (2011 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2011. | |
2011-06-28 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-15 | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Monroe, Starr, Whitsett. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-10 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-09 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-09 | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Greenlick. | |
2011-06-08 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-07 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-01 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-25 | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. | |
2011-05-17 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the Co-Speaker. | |
2011-05-17 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-29 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-11 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-03-10 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Higher Education. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |