OR HB2727 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 510, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 510, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Land and Conservation and Development to convene work group to examine strategies for expanding early learning and care facilities in this state. Directs Department of Land and Conservation and Development to convene work group to examine strategies for expanding early learning and care facilities in this state. Sunsets work group on January 2, 2025. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to work group to examine expansion of child care facilities; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 510, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Weber. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 4--Bonham, Findley, Girod, Smith DB; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-14 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Elmer. |
2023-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 12--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Elmer, Goodwin, Hieb, Levy B, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Wallan; Excused, 1--Hartman; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-03-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |