OR HB2723 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Health Evidence Review Commission to evaluate therapeutic and clinical effectiveness of hippotherapy for purpose of possible inclusion on prioritized list of health services provided in medical assistance program and report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health by December 31, 2017. Sunsets January 2, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to hippotherapy; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Sen. Mark Hass [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Barreto, Johnson, Reschke, Smith G; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |