OR HB2720 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-06 - Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Bill failed.Ayes, 14; nays, 16--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-06 - Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Bill failed.Ayes, 14; nays, 16--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to conduct study related to certain virtual public charter schools. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to study of virtual public charter schools; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Bill failed.Ayes, 14; nays, 16--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider carried by voice vote. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-30 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 22--Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 4--Barreto, Bentz, Boone, Williamson. |
2017-06-29 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-31 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |