OR HB2718 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates tax credit for workers at child care facilities rated three stars or higher with quality rating and improvement system. Creates tax credit for workers at child care facilities rated three stars or higher with quality rating and improvement system. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, and before January 1, 2028. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for child care workers; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2718 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2718/Introduced |