OR HB2717 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates requirement for ambulatory surgical centers and extended stay centers to file ambulatory surgery discharge abstract records with Oregon Health Authority. Requires Oregon Health Authority to take steps to limit cost to hospitals, ambulatory surgical centers and extended stay centers for compiling and reporting records and data. Limits fee charged by authority for collecting records and data.] Requires authority to adopt rules, in collaboration with representatives of ambulatory surgical centers, for data reporting by ambulatory surgical centers and extended stay centers. Authorizes Oregon Patient Safety Commission to share with authority data reported to commission by ambulatory surgical centers and extended stay centers. Requires Health Evidence Review Commission to develop evidence-based guidelines for extended stay centers based on data collected over two- and four-year periods. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to data collected from health care providers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |