OR HB2717 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases penalties for assault committed against public transit employee if employee is assaulted while acting within scope of employment. Increases penalties for assault committed against public transit employee if employee is assaulted while acting within scope of employment. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to assault in the third degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] |
Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |