OR HB2714 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments to approve certain reconstruction after 2020 wildfires. Requires local governments to approve certain reconstruction after 2020 wildfires. Limits requirements for building permits or septic permits for reconstruction. Sunsets January 2, 2030. Tolls time that city or county may consider nonconforming use discontinued during emergency that limits resumption of use. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to resuming uses after emergencies; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2714 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2714/Introduced |