OR HB2702 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person that receives state financial incentive for development of renewable energy generation facility to maintain nameplate capacity of facility for period of at least 25 years. Requires person that receives state financial incentive for development of renewable energy generation facility to maintain nameplate capacity of facility for period of at least 25 years.
Title
Relating to state financial incentives for renewable energy generation facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 23 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-24 | House | Motion to withdraw from Climate, Energy, and Environment failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 33--Andersen, Bowman, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 4--Bynum, Owens, Reynolds, Wright. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |