OR HB2701 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases retirement benefits and lowers normal retirement age under Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan for telecommunicators and certain employees of Oregon State Hospital. Increases retirement benefits and lowers normal retirement age under Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan for telecommunicators and certain employees of Oregon State Hospital.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Travis Nelson [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Rep. Jules Walters [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |