OR HB2701 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 422, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 422, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces ability of Higher Education Coordinating Commission to place career school on probation with ability of commission to issue career school notice for corrective action. Requires commission to notify career school about investigations and to engage with both career school and any affected students during investigations. When career school requests contested case hearing, prohibits commission from suspending or revoking license of career school prior to determination by hearing officer that there is proper cause. Takes effect July 1, 2018.
Title
Relating to sanctions for career schools; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 422, (2017 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Bentz, McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Holvey; Excused, 1--Heard; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Fahey, Gomberg, Marsh. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |