OR HB2698 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires original equipment manufacturer to make available to owner of originated equipment or independent repair provider on fair and reasonable terms any part, tool, documentation or other device or implement that original equipment manufacturer makes available to authorized repair provider for purpose of diagnosing, maintaining or repairing originated equipment. Requires original equipment manufacturer to make available to owner of originated equipment or independent repair provider on fair and reasonable terms any part, tool, documentation or other device or implement that original equipment manufacturer makes available to authorized repair provider for purpose of diagnosing, maintaining or repairing originated equipment. Provides that person who suffers ascertainable loss of money or property has right to bring action to recover damages for violation of provisions of Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a right to repair consumer electronic equipment; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-17HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback