OR HB2698 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Chapter 196, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Chapter 196, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to motions to set aside.
Title
Relating to motions to set aside.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Chapter 196, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-06-01 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-25 | President signed. | |
2011-05-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-17 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Bates, Johnson, Starr. | |
2011-05-16 | Second reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2011-05-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-04-07 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading. Carried by Bailey. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-03-28 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |