OR HB2693 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health benefit plan to reimburse cost of covered telemedicine health service provided by health professional licensed or certified in this state if same health service is provided in person.
Title
Relating to reimbursing the costs of telemedicine health services.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2693 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2693/Introduced |