OR HB2692 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 111, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Chapter 111, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee to publish on website of Oregon Health Authority within seven days recommendations concerning Practitioner-Managed Prescription Drug Plan. Requires Director of the Oregon Health Authority to make decision to approve, disapprove or modify committee's recommendation as soon as practicable and publish decision on website. Requires decision of director to be implemented no later than seven days after decision is published on website. Permits interested persons to request reconsideration of director's approval of recommendation no later than seven days after director's determination is published on website. Allows director to immediately implement recommendation or delay recommendation based on specified conditions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Practitioner-Managed Prescription Drug Plan; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Chapter 111, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 13, 2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Girod, Winters. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Barreto, Noble, Sprenger, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |