OR HB2691 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 87, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 87, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes statutory authority for Oregon Psychiatric Access Line program operated by Oregon Health and Science University and financed by Legislative Assembly through appropriations. Requires psychiatrists providing advice to primary care providers through access line to abide] be informed by guidelines in Practitioner-Managed Prescription Drug Plan or recommended by Pharmacy and Therapeutics Committee.
Title
Relating to psychiatric consultations with primary care providers who care for patients with mental health disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Sen. Denyc Boles [R] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 87, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Sanchez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 20, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |