OR HB2689 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish grant program for purpose of facilitating nonlethal deterrence of wildlife conflict species by farmers and ranchers. Directs State Department of Agriculture to establish grant program for purpose of facilitating nonlethal deterrence of wildlife conflict species by farmers and ranchers. Establishes Wildlife Conflict Species Nonlethal Deterrence Fund to support grant program. Appropriates moneys to department out of General Fund for deposit into Wildlife Conflict Species Nonlethal Deterrence Fund. Sunsets grant program and Wildlife Conflict Species Nonlethal Deterrence Fund on January 2, 2027. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to nonlethal deterrence of wildlife conflict species; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2689 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2689/Introduced |