OR HB2685 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that Secretary of State provide official Military or Overseas Elector Ballots for elections held on date of primary election that permit military or overseas electors to rank candidates by order of preference. Requires that Secretary of State provide official Military or Overseas Elector Ballots for elections held on date of primary election that permit military or overseas electors to rank candidates by order of preference. Applies to elections held on date of primary election occurring on or after January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of ranked ballots at elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback