OR HB2682 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 234, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 234, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person that rents utility vehicle to contracting agency to provide records that describe in detail results of most recent inspection that person performed or had performed on utility vehicle's traction, structure, power train, control components and related parts and equipment in compliance with specified rules, regulations or standards. Directs Construction Contractors Board to adopt rules that require persons that lease construction vehicles in this state to maintain construction vehicles in condition that allows for safe and reliable operation of construction vehicles, to keep certain logs, records and documents and to provide or offer to provide training in safe and reliable operation of construction vehicles.] Requires board to inspect, at least once every two years, persons that lease construction vehicles in this state and assess level of compliance with board's rules. Permits board to charge costs of inspection to person that is subjected to inspection.] Requires contracting agency, as part of contracting agency's determination of whether bidder for public improvement contract is responsible, to check board's assessment of person that supplies construction vehicles for public improvement contract and require bidder to obtain construction vehicles only from person that achieves passing grade from board.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.] Requires person that rents utility vehicle to contracting agency to provide records that describe in detail results of most recent inspection that person performed or had performed on utility vehicle's traction, structure, power train, control components and related parts and equipment in compliance with specified rules, regulations or standards. Provides that person must also provide instructions about how to comply with recommendations from utility vehicle's manufacturer for operating and maintaining utility vehicle, records of all incidents in which use of utility vehicle resulted in injuries or deaths because of equipment failure and affidavit in which person attests to compliance with applicable safety standards and to performing or having performed regular inspections of utility vehicle. Permits contracting agency to delay paying consideration due under agreement to rent utility vehicle until person replaces or repairs utility vehicle that does not meet applicable standards and to seek offset of or reimbursement for labor costs that contracting agency incurs as result of delays to work from utility vehicle that does not meet applicable standards. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to safety standards for construction vehicles; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] |
Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 234, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |