OR HB2682 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 291, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Chapter 291, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes City of Portland to designate speed that is five miles per hour lower than statutory speed when highway is located in residence district and highway is not arterial highway.
Title
Relating to highway speeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Chapter 291, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Burdick, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher, Winters; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 05-31 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Esquivel; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |