OR HB2682 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to convene work group of public university presidents to identify classes required for bachelor's degree. Requires work group to post document setting forth findings on commission's website and transmit document to community colleges. Sunsets work group at convening of 2017 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to course transfers to public universities; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2682 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2682/Introduced |