OR HB2680 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes administrator of Oregon Prescription Drug Program to cooperate with Canadian provinces or territories in bulk purchase of prescription drugs. Requires administrator to solicit cooperation of provinces and territories no later than December 31, 2019, and to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by December 1 of each year, beginning in 2020, on responses to solicitations. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to bulk purchasing of prescription drugs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Barbara Warner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |