OR HB2679 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Hospital Rate Commission in Oregon Health Authority to review hospital charges billed by certain hospitals and recommend to Oregon Health Authority whether to approve charges as reasonable based on prescribed criteria. Specifies membership and duties of commission. Imposes civil penalty on hospital that bills unreasonable charges. Allows persons filing complaint with commission to recover reasonable attorney fees and costs if authority determines that charge to person for hospital services was unreasonable. Requires hospitals to pay fee to commission. Creates Hospital Rate Commission Fund consisting of fees and fines collected by commission. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to commission for carrying out provisions of Act.
Title
Relating to hospital charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2679 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2679/Introduced |