OR HB2676 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for modified method of apportionment of business income of interstate broadcaster for purposes of corporate excise taxation. Continues use of gross receipts from customers with in-state commercial domicile in numerator of apportionment calculation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to apportionment of income of interstate broadcasters; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |