OR HB2675 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that state structural specialty code does not apply to structure located on farm or forest operation and used for purpose related to agriculture that requires not more than 20 persons to occupy structure at any one time outside of harvest season or not more than 40 persons to occupy structure at any one time during harvest season. Provides that state structural specialty code does not apply to structure located on farm or forest operation and used for purpose related to agriculture that requires not more than 20 persons to occupy structure at any one time outside of harvest season or not more than 40 persons to occupy structure at any one time during harvest season.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to agricultural buildings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-13HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback