OR HB2673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to create Oregon Educational Support Professional of Year Program.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Educational Support Professional of the Year Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Kimberly Wallan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2673 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2673/Introduced |