OR HB2670 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that contracting agency, in solicitation for procurement, must require bidder or proposer to disclose violations of certain laws. Permits bidder or proposer to describe circumstances of violation and steps bidder or proposer took to remedy violation and improve future compliance with laws. Requires contracting agency, in consultation with Attorney General or local contracting review board, to determine whether violations, remedies and assurances of improved compliance, taken together, warrant finding that bidder or proposer has satisfactory record of integrity and is otherwise responsible. Provides that contractor must require prospective subcontractor to make disclosures similar to disclosures contractor made to contracting agency in bid or proposal. Requires public contract to provide that contractor and subcontractor must update list of violations every 180 days during term of public contract. Permits contracting agency to consider certain actions after disclosure of new violations. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to disclosures of violations of certain laws required in response to a solicitation for a public contract; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2670 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2670/Introduced |