OR HB2668 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates to Water Resources Department $250,000 for distribution to Nesika Beach Water District for purpose of funding fire protection infrastructure. Appropriates to Water Resources Department $250,000 for distribution to Nesika Beach Water District for purpose of funding fire protection infrastructure. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to fire protection infrastructure; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2668 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2668/Introduced |