OR HB2666 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 267, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 267, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gives community college recognized student government authority to establish process and allocate mandatory student-initiated fees, subject to refusal under certain circumstances by board of education of community college district or president of community college. Gives community college recognized student government authority to establish process and allocate mandatory student-initiated fees, subject to refusal under certain circumstances by board of education of community college district or president of community college.
Title
Relating to community college mandatory incidental fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 267, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Winters. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Carried over to 05-30 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-19 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-04-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 25--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Wilson, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |