OR HB2663 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department for 2021-2023 biennium to carry out integrated pest management program to combat Sudden Oak Death. Appropriates moneys to State Forestry Department for 2021-2023 biennium to carry out integrated pest management program to combat Sudden Oak Death. Requires department to expend part of appropriation as grant for task force to encourage and coordinate county integrated pest management programs to combat Sudden Oak Death. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to Sudden Oak Death; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |