OR HB2662 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Education for transfer to Coquille School District for Lincoln School of Early Learning. Appropriates moneys to Department of Education for transfer to Coquille School District for Lincoln School of Early Learning. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to funding for early learning; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Early Childhood with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |