OR HB2662 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases cigarette tax and provides for distribution of increase in revenue. Applies increase to cigarettes distributed on or after January 1, 2018, and to existing inventories of cigarettes not yet acquired by consumers as of January 1, 2018. Removes per-unit maximum tax on cigars. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax on tobacco products; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Sen. Ginny Burdick [D] |
Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2662 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2662/Introduced |