OR HB2661 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 656, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 656, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires long term care referral provider to be registered with Department of Human Services. Imposes certain requirements on long term care referral providers. Makes long term care referral provider mandatory reporter of elder abuse. Makes violation of certain provisions unfair trade practice. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to long term care referral; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 656, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 3--Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-20 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |