OR HB2660 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Environmental Quality to create list of charges for permits, licenses, authorizations or services provided by the department. Requires Department of Environmental Quality to create list of charges for permits, licenses, authorizations or services provided by the department. Requires department to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment on list and costs of providing permits, licenses, authorizations or services. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to amounts charged by the Department of Environmental Quality; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-03-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback