OR HB2658 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Chapter 183, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Chapter 183, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Department of Transportation to issue veterans' recognition registration plate to Gold Star Family member who is sibling of person who was killed in action in armed conflict while serving in Armed Forces of United States. Declares emergency, effective October 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to Gold Star Family members; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | House | Chapter 183, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 1, 2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Hansell, Thomsen. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hoyle, Vega Pederson. |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-17 | House | Second reading. |
2015-03-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |