OR HB2657 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to not consider days pupil is absent when determining aggregate days membership for purposes of distributions from State School Fund. Provides that aggregate days membership be calculated based on number of hours of instruction pupil receives during school year. Takes effect July 1, 2016.
Title
Relating to distributions from the State School Fund; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-22 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules, and then to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |