OR HB2656 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 505, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 505, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to make available to students of school district specified informational surveys and to provide parents and guardians with notice and opportunity to review survey before it is administered. Requires school districts to make available to students of school district specified informational surveys and to provide parents and guardians with notice and opportunity to review survey before it is administered. Allows parents or guardians to decline to have their children participate in survey, and allows students to decline to participate in survey or decline to answer individual questions of survey. Directs Superintendent of Public Instruction to convene advisory committee to explore options for expanding or revising education accountability framework.
Title
Relating to improvements in student success.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Ben Bowman [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Jules Walters [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 505, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 5--Bonham, Findley, Girod, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 16--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 4--Hieb, Levy B, Morgan, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-05-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-30 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |