OR HB2654 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 149, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 149, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes electric cooperative to use or allow for use of electric easement in provision of broadband services, subject to certain conditions and exceptions. Authorizes electric utility] cooperative to use or allow for use of electric easement in provision of broadband services, subject to certain conditions and exceptions. Provides process for property owner to bring action for damages if use in provision of broadband services results in expanded use of easement.
Title
Relating to use of easements for provision of broadband.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 149, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Anderson, Findley, Hansell, President Courtney, Thatcher. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh, Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |