OR HB2649 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Board of Education to adopt by rule complaint process to report school district policy in violation of state law prohibiting harassment, intimidation, bullying and cyberbullying. Directs board to adopt rules relating to complaint investigation and standards to determine whether school district policy prohibiting harassment, intimidation, bullying and cyberbullying complies with and is applied in accordance with state law. Directs Department of Education to establish system to track number of reported incidences of harassment, intimidation, bullying or cyberbullying that occur in each school district. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to procedures related to hostile education environments; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |