OR HB2648 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 297, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 297, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows pharmacist or pharmacy technician to transfer drug containing pseudoephedrine without prescription to person who is at least 18 years of age and presents person's valid government-issued photo identification. Allows pharmacist or pharmacy technician to transfer drug containing pseudoephedrine without prescription to person who is at least 18 years of age and presents person's valid government-issued photo identification. Requires pharmacist or pharmacy technician, prior to transfer, to submit specified information into electronic system designed to prevent illegal transfer of drugs containing pseudoephedrine. Requires pharmacist or pharmacy technician to record specified information about transfer of drug containing pseudoephedrine. Specifies maximum amount of pseudoephedrine that person may receive without prescription. Establishes storage requirements for drug containing pseudoephedrine. Clarifies that measure does not apply to drugs transferred pursuant to prescription. Punishes violation by 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to pseudoephedrine; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 297, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Heard, Riley; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Alonso Leon, Marsh, Smith Warner, Williams; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman. |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |