OR HB2644 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 121, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Renames portion of Interstate 5, beginning in Albany and ending in Salem, to Atomic Veterans and Atomic Cleanup Veterans Memorial Highway. Renames portion of Interstate 5, beginning in Albany and ending in Salem, to Atomic Veterans and Atomic Cleanup Veterans Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to atomic cleanup veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 121, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
2021-06-01HouseGovernor signed.
2021-05-25SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-19SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-05-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Anderson, Thatcher.
2021-05-18SenateSecond reading.
2021-05-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-11SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-05-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2021-04-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Drazan, Levy.
2021-04-14HouseCarried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-13HouseCarried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-01HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2644
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2644/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2644/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2644/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2644/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31732
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=516086
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32357
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=523561

Bill Comments

feedback