OR HB2643 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 648, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Chapter 648, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes designation of enterprise zone and zone and city for electronic commerce, addition of zone cosponsor and change of enterprise zone boundary without application process, subject to determination by Oregon Business Development Department that certain statutory requirements met. Requires submission of documentation to department before designation, addition or change, and consultation with department. Eliminates numeric limit on number of enterprise zones that may be designated at any time. Lowers minimum cost requirement for qualified property used in electronic commerce outside zone for electronic commerce.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to enterprise zones; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Chapter 648, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015. |
2015-07-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Burdick, Olsen. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-01 | House | Passed.Ayes, 46; Nays, 13--Barton, Buckley, Fagan, Gomberg, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Krieger, Lininger, Nosse, Smith Warner, Taylor, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-01 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith. |
2015-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. |
2015-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2015-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-05-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2015-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |