OR HB2642 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires practitioner to query electronic prescription monitoring system with respect to patient prior to issuing to, or renewing for, patient prescription for certain prescription drugs. Requires practitioner to query electronic prescription monitoring system with respect to patient prior to issuing to, or renewing for, patient prescription for certain prescription drugs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to prescription drug monitoring; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] |
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |