OR HB2641 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies requirement that start-up businesses that may be assisted by regional collaboration facilitated by Oregon Business Development Department have as purpose commercialization of university-based or university-assisted research and increasing number, and ensuring retention, of such businesses. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Business Development Department for direct distribution pro rata to Oregon State University Advantage Accelerator (OSU Advantage) and Regional Accelerator & Innovation Network (RAIN Eugene) and requires equal match. Provides that start-up businesses assisted with appropriated moneys must be traded sector businesses or businesses with traded sector potential, with stated exceptions. Requires OSU Advantage and RAIN Eugene each to submit report to interim legislative committees related to economic development on or before September 15, 2020, setting forth specified metrics related to their assistance to start-up businesses. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to entrepreneurial ecosystem development programs located outside Metro; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback