OR HB2639 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes private citizen immune from civil or criminal liability arising from good faith acts made in connection with fighting wildfire. Makes private citizen immune from civil or criminal liability arising from good faith acts made in connection with fighting wildfire.
Title
Relating to liability for actions of private citizen related to fighting wildfires.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2639 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2639/Introduced |