OR HB2638 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs district school boards to ensure that buildings regularly used by students have proper heating, air conditioning and ventilation systems to provide temperatures within acceptable range for learning and safety. Directs district school boards to ensure that buildings regularly used by students have proper heating, air conditioning and ventilation systems to provide temperatures within acceptable range for learning and safety. Requires compliance by January 1, 2029.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to temperatures in school buildings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback