OR HB2638 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 54, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 54, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies membership of Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission. Modifies membership and chairperson] of Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission.
Title
Relating to the Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 54, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |