OR HB2636 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies annual salaries of judges of Supreme Court, Court of Appeals, Oregon Tax Court and circuit courts. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to compensation of judges; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |