OR HB2634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 535, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 535, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows surviving spouse or disabled heir of individual whose homestead was granted deferral under homestead property tax deferral program to continue deferral without having owned or occupied homestead for five years. Allows surviving spouse or disabled heir of individual whose homestead was granted deferral under homestead property tax deferral program to continue deferral without having owned or occupied homestead for five years. Creates, for purposes of eligibility of property for homestead property tax deferral program, minimum cap of $250,000 for maximum allowable real market value of homestead. Directs Department of Revenue to adjust minimum cap for maximum allowable real market value annually according to change in Consumer Price Index. Allows claim for deferral to be filed late, with payment of fee. Modifies procedure for allowing claims for deferral in excess of maximum allowable number of claims for property tax year. Adjusts payment of interest on delinquent deferred taxes between county and department. Extends sunset for deferral program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the homestead property tax deferral program; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 535, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Carried over to 06-24 by unanimous consent. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Drazan. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2021-06-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |