OR HB2633 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 421, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 421, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that statutes regulating sexual abuse specific treatment apply to provision of sexual abuse specific treatment to any person. Allows Health Licensing Office to issue certification as secondary associate sex offender therapist to qualified applicant. Clarifies that Health Licensing Office may discipline certified clinical sex offender therapist, certified associate sex offender therapist and certified secondary associate sex offender therapist. Prohibits provision of sexual abuse specific treatment services by person not authorized by Sex Offender Treatment Board. Creates exemptions to prohibition. Requires person authorized by board to provide sexual abuse specific treatment services but who did not hold active mental health professional license upon date of authorization to obtain mental health professional license by January 1, 2021. Requires Department of Corrections, Oregon Health Authority and Oregon Youth Authority each to report to Legislative Assembly not later than December 31, 2018, on any steps agencies would need to take to ensure certain employees meet certification requirements. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sex offender treatment; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 421, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 22, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Bentz, McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |